Cleveland v. JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC
Plaintiff: Kayo Cleveland
Defendant: JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00286
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayo Cleveland. JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Adkins, Micah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 6/13/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/13/19. (mpp) Copy to Pltf counsel
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (mpp)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Kayo Cleveland. (Adkins, Micah) NO CORPORATE PARENT STATED - Modified on 6/19/2019 (mpp).
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2413535, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Kayo Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Defendant) (Adkins, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH Portfolio Debt Equities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayo Cleveland
Represented By: Micah Stephen Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?