Drake v. Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Von Drake
Defendant: Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. and Subaru of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00337
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Eric Von Drake that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/3/19. (copy mailed to plaintiff at Selma address) (cmj)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Eric Von Drake re #3 Order. (skb) Referred to MJ Milling (PSU).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file the Court's form for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees or, in the alternative, to pay the $400.00 filing fee on or before 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 07/15/2019. (Copy of Order, IFP Form and Pro Se Litigant Guide mailed to Plaintiff as directed) (nah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Von Drake. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (tgw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd., Subaru of America, Inc. filed by Eric Von Drake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Proposed Summons and Request for Waiver) (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Von Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?