Jackson v. Marion Military Institute (MMI)
Plaintiff: Christine Jackson
Defendant: Marion Military Institute (MMI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00629
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Christine Jackson. (Townsend, Tyrone)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Marion Military Institute (MMI). Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to motion by 10/30/2019. Replies to response due by 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/10/2019. (nah)
October 10, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Partial Motion to Dismiss Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (clr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
October 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (nah)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Marion Military Institute (MMI). (Hart, Christine)
September 30, 2019 Answer due from Marion Military Institute (MMI) on 10/9/2019 pursuant to FRCP 12(a) per Doc. 7 showing MMI served on 09/18/2019. (nah)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on MMI Becky Long on 09/18/2019, filed by Christine Jackson. (Townsend, Tyrone)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Marion Military Institute (MMI). Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Tyrone Townsend to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/12/2019. (clr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Christine Jackson (Townsend, Tyrone)
September 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Tyrone Townsend to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (nah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case re-assigned to Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. District Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Tyrone Townsend to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2474219, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Christine Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert Good Standing) (Townsend, Tyrone)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marion Military Institute (MMI) ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2474201, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Christine Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Townsend, Tyrone) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Marion Military Institute (MMI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Military Institute (MMI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jackson
Represented By: Tyrone Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?