Dodson v. Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donna A. Dodson
Defendant: Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00633
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (mab)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Bazemore, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary K Fisher on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Fisher, Hillary)
October 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Bazemore, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company. (Bazemore, Thomas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Northcutt on behalf of Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC (Northcutt, Robert)
September 24, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp) Copies to counsel
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (mpp) Copies to counsel
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Brenner, Theodore)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Theodore I. Brenner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/20/19. (ktw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION and APPLICATION for Theodore I. Brenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2479377, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Brenner, Theodore)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC. (Bryan, Chad)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC from Circuit Court of Marengo County, AL, case number CV-2019-900083. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2476077, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1-State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh 1-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exh 1-State Court Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit Exh 1-Plaintiff's Discovery to Defendants, #5 Exhibit Exh 1-Plaintiff's Summons to Defendants, #6 Exhibit Exh 1-Service of Wright, #7 Exhibit Exh 1-Service of Allstate, #8 Exhibit Exh 2-Flood Declaration Page, #9 Exhibit Exh 3-Removal Authorization) (Bryan, Chad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna A. Dodson
Represented By: Woodford W. Dinning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright National Flood Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Chad Wesley Bryan
Represented By: Theodore Brenner
Represented By: Robert F. Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E. Bazemore, III
Represented By: Hillary K Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?