McCaskey v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jacinta McCaskey
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00741
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion #4 to Remand filed by Jacinta McCaskey. (Morgan, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Opposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Opposition) (Wells, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The report is due ten days after the entry of an order denying the motion to remand. If the action is remanded, no report will be required. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/20/19. (Cassady, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Report of Parties Planning Meeting filed by GEICO Casualty Company. (Wells, David)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #4 Motion to Remand. Defendant shall respond to the substantive and procedural issues raised by the Plaintiff on or before November 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 11/7/19. (Cassady, William)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Jacinta McCaskey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Morgan, James)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/7/2019. (eec)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Casualty Company from State Court, case number CV-2018-900082. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2488377, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Wells, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaskey v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacinta McCaskey
Represented By: James Richard Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: David Robert Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?