Watts v. North America Onsite
Plaintiff: Shawalto Watts
Defendant: North America Onsite
Case Number: 2:2019cv00908
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order DENYING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shawalto Watts. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file another IFP on or before 1/14/2020 and is ORDERED to respond carefully to each question and include what he owns as set out. Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff IFP form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/18/2019. (srd) Copies to Plaintiff.
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shawalto Watts. (Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr.(PSU) on 12/5/19) (tot)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/5/19. (copy mailed to Plf on 11/5/19) (tot)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North America Onsite filed by Shawalto Watts. (Referred to MJ/Milling(PSU) on 11/5/19) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. North America Onsite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North America Onsite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawalto Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?