City of Uniontown, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Uniontown, Alabama
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Actavis, Inc., Actavis, PLS and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00128
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
2 Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 11 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Northern District of Ohio, Case Number 1:20-op-45117. (skb)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent electronically to requesting District. Case Closed. (tot)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Uniontown, Alabama. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; Actavis, LLC served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; Cephalon, Inc. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; McKesson Corporation served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Noramco, Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020 (Sutton, William)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Notice entered 3/5/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 4/17/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/05/2020. (srd)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC., Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by City of Uniontown, Alabama (APG)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff City of Uniontown, Alabama. (Sutton, William)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Sutton, William)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2580511, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sutton, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Uniontown, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Uniontown, Alabama
Represented By: William Sutton
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Rhon E. Jones
Represented By: Jere L. Beasley
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?