Redinger v. Magic City Organics, LLC
Plaintiff: Hope Marian Redinger
Defendant: Magic City Organics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00204
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 ***Case Transfer Confirmation. Case received and opened in Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 2:20-cv-00564. (skb)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #5 Response to Order filed by Hope Marian Redinger. It is ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Southern Division of the Northern District of Alabama, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), for the convenience of the parties and witnesses and in the interests of justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/23/2020. (eec)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, by Hope Marian Redinger filed by Hope Marian Redinger. (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order re: #1 Complaint, filed by Hope Marian Redinger. Based on the contents of the Complaint, it appears to the Court that venue has been improperly laid in the Northern Division of the Southern District of Alabama. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to advise this Court, not later than April 22, 2020, why this action should not be dismissed or, in the alternative, transferred to the Southern Division of the Northern District of Alabama. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 4/22/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/7/2020. (eec)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Magic City Organics, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Magic City Organics, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2596618, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Hope Marian Redinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redinger v. Magic City Organics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic City Organics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Marian Redinger
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?