Jackson v. Quicken Loans Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Jackson
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00313
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 REFERRAL OF #25 Response to #14 Motion to Remand to Judge Moorer. (mab)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Quicken Loans Inc.. (Knight, Griffin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #23 filed by Marion Bank reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Third Party Defendants Marion Bank & Trust Company, Marion Bancshares, Inc.. identifying Corporate Parent Marion Bancshares, Inc. for Marion Bank & Trust Company.. (Sefton, Patrick) Modified on 7/30/2020 (tot).
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #8 Third Party Complaint by Marion Bank & Trust Company. (Sefton, Patrick) Modified on 7/30/2020 (tot).
July 20, 2020 REFERRAL OF #21 Reply to #20 Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (mab)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion #7 filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Knight, Griffin)
July 13, 2020 REFERRAL OF #20 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
July 10, 2020 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Christine Jackson. (Turner, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension filed by Marion Bank and Trust Company. Deadline for Marion Bank to file its responsive pleading to Quicken Loan's third-party complaint is EXTENDED to July 30, 2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/8/2020. (mab)
July 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
July 8, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Marion Bank & Trust Company. (Sefton, Patrick)
July 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L.W. Sefton on behalf of Marion Bank & Trust Company (Sefton, Patrick)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order re: #14 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court and #15 brief in support. Defendant's responses due by 8/4/2020. Plaintiff's reply due by 8/12/2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/6/2020. (mab)
July 2, 2020 REFERRAL OF #14 MOTION to Remand, #15 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand to Judge Moorer. (tot)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 Brief filed by Christine Jackson Plaintiff's Brief In Support of Motion For Remand. (Turner, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christine Jackson. (Turner, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Counter-Claim, by Christine Jackson. (Turner, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Via Certified Mail by Quicken Loans Inc.. Marion Bank & Trust Company served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020 (Knight, Griffin)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re: #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file any response to the motion by 7/13/2020. Defendant MERS shall have until 7/21/2020, to file any reply. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/19/2020. (mab)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Marion Bank & Trust Company. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 Case re-assigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
June 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tot)
June 17, 2020 Answer to #8 Counterclaim due from Christine Jackson pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (tot)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Marion Bank & Trust Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Christine Jackson by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Knight, Griffin)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Knight, Griffin)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statements #4 filed by Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC, and #5 filed by Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Merscorp Holdings, Inc., ICE Mortgage Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate ICE Mortgage Services, LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc... (Knight, Griffin)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.. (Knight, Griffin)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Notice of Removal in Circuit Court by All Defendants re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Knight, Griffin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Emailed Disclosure Statement form to Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., & Quicken Loans Inc.; Disclosure Statements Due by 6/17/2020. (mab)
June 11, 2020 Answer due from Quicken Loans Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (mab)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2627242, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Knight, Griffin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Quicken Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Ginny Willcox Leavens
Represented By: Griffin Lane Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Jackson
Represented By: Robert H. Turner, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?