The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: M.B.2, Danielle Hamilton, K.B.1, Kimberly Butler, Tramona Moore, K.B.2, Regina Moore, E.B., J.W., M.B.1, L.B., N.B., Andreal Williams, Shakeita Brooks, S.B., G.B. and Shameeka Jackson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00358
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on Kimberly Butler on 8/31/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on G.B. on 8/31/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on E.B. on 8/31/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on N.B. on 8/31/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on M.B.1 on 8/31/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/15/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by Shakeita Brooks and Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America Notice of Service (Long, Felicia)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Shakeita Brooks. (Strength, Brian)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Shakeita Brooks. (Strength, Brian)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on J.W., a minor on 8/16/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on K.B.2, a minor on 8/11/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on M.B., a minor on 8/6/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint in Interpleader served on Danielle Hamilton on 8/6/2020, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andreal Williams. Andreal Williams waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Blocker, Ariel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/20/20. (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 7/20/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/31/2020.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/20/20. (cmj)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shakeita Brooks, Kimberly Butler, E.B., G.B., Danielle Hamilton, J.W., Shameeka Jackson, K.B.1, K.B.2, L.B., M.B.1, M.B.2, Regina Moore, Tramona Moore, N.B., S.B.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Long, Felicia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2645344, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Summons - L.B., #9 Summons - S.B., #10 Summons - Shameeka Jackson, #11 Summons - G.B., #12 Summons - E.B., #13 Summons - N.B., #14 Summons - M.B.1, #15 Summons - Kimberly Butler, #16 Summons - K.B.1, #17 Summons - Shakeita Brooks, #18 Summons - J.W., #19 Summons - Tramona Moore, #20 Summons - M.B.2, #21 Summons - Danielle Hamilton, #22 Summons - K.B.2, #23 Summons - Regina Moore) (Long, Felicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.B.1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tramona Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.B.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreal Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shakeita Brooks
Represented By: Brian P. Strength
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shameeka Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Felicia A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?