Harper v. Parker Towing Company
Plaintiff: Steven Harper
Defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00382
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Harper. Parker Towing Company, Inc. served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/12/2020 (Baun, Gary)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION and APPLICATION for Gary Wm. Baun to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2681282, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Steven Harper. (Baun, Gary)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/22/20. (cmj)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Parker Towing Company, Inc.. (McCarthy, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Steven Harper Of Service Attempt (O'Bryan, Dennis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Alias Summons Issued as to Parker Towing Company, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Steven Harper (O'Bryan, Dennis)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/19/2020. (bld)
August 19, 2020 REFERRAL OF #7 Notice of Filing Certificate of Good Standing to Judge Bivins. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Good Standing by Steven Harper re #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (cmj)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 8/6/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/14/2020.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 8/6/20. (cmj)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Parker Towing Company, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Steven Harper (O'Bryan, Dennis)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Application & Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Michigan re: #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Steven Harper (O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 8/4/2020 (tot).
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2653421, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Steven Harper. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Parker Towing Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2653401, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Steven Harper. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/29/2020. (O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 8/4/2020 (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Parker Towing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Towing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Harper
Represented By: Dennis Michael O'Bryan
Represented By: Gary William Baun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?