Barge v. Airbus Americas
Plaintiff: Mansfield Barge
Defendant: Airbus Americas
Case Number: 2:2020cv00485
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of green card re: doc. 5 served 10/28/20 as to Mansfield Barge (cmj)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filing Fee of $400 due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/26/20. (copy mailed certified per Order 70191120000220687736) (cmj)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mansfield Barge. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order DENYING Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a new motion or pay the filing fee NLT 10/27/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/6/20. (skb) (Copy of Order w/IFP to Plaintiff on 10/6/20)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Airbus Americas, filed by Mansfield Barge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd) Referred to Judge Bivins (PSU).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mansfield Barge. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (srd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barge v. Airbus Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airbus Americas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansfield Barge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?