Long v. Saul
Plaintiff: Barbara Long
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00592
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Owen Todd on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Todd, Victoria)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 12/21/2020, answer due 3/22/2021. (srd)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 12/17/2020 as to Social Security Administration. (srd)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 12/16/2020 as to U.S. Attorney General. (srd)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/10/2020. (srd)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2020: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (srd).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barbara Long. Clerk is DIRECTED to serve the Defendant as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/10/2020. (srd)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barbara Long. (Coplin, William)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Barbara Long. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).
December 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (srd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Long
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria Owen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?