Johnson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Mary Johnson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00604
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Stepan on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Stepan, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Attorney served on 2/5/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (cmj)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/3/21. (cmj)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul 70191120000220686852, U.S. Attorney 70191120000220686869 and U.S. Attorney General 70191120000220686876. (cmj)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis;finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/3/21. (cmj)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #6 Motion to Amend Complaint: The Court construes the motion #6 as the Plaintiff's first amended complaint, filed as a matter of course under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, the #6 motion to amend is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/2/2021. (ctn)
February 2, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mary Johnson. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Mary Johnson. (Stiller, Micki)
February 1, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for plaintiff to either pay the $402 filing fee or complete and file a second amended IFP motion or a supplemental affidavit by 2/2/21. ( Filing Fee or Second Amended IFP motion due by 2/2/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/12/21. (cmj)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mary Johnson. (Stiller, Micki)
January 11, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order for plaintiff to either pay the filing fee in this action, file and amended IFP motion or file a supplemental affidavit as set out, no later than 1/11/21. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 1/11/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/21/20. (cmj)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mary Johnson. (Stiller, Micki)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Mary Johnson. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons) (Stiller, Micki) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).
December 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Johnson
Represented By: Micki Beth Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Stepan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?