Rivers v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Rivers
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00605
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 1/29/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (srd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 01/04/2021 as to Social Security Administration. (srd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 12/31/2020 as to Attorney General. (srd)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Owen Todd on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Todd, Victoria)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/23/2020. (srd)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2020: #1 Cert Mail Receipt) (srd).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/22/20. (ktw)
December 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (srd)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Rivers. (Coplin, William)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by James Rivers. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rivers
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria Owen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?