Sturdivant v. Saul
Plaintiff: Gloria Sturdivant
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00017
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of SS Complaint served 1/21/21 as to SSI (cmj)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of SS Complaint served 1/21/21 as to USAG (cmj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Owen Todd on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Todd, Victoria)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA served on 1/13/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (cmj)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/8/21. (cmj)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul 70191120000220686944, U.S. Attorney 70191120000220686913 and U.S. Attorney General 70191120000220686951. (cmj)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/8/21. (cmj)
January 8, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gloria Sturdivant. (Coplin, William)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Gloria Sturdivant. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2021: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturdivant v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Sturdivant
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Victoria Owen Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?