Mitchell et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lula Mitchell, Larry Johnson, Joyce Johnson, Thelma Petty-Cosey, Sarah Roberson, Maurice Williams and Telecia Hardy
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company and Esurance Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00347
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, GRANTING #10 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Erik D. Peterson. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/17/2021. (mab)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Johnson, Telecia Hardy, Larry Johnson, Lula Mitchell, Thelma Petty-Cosey. Esurance Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (McWherter, James)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Johnson, Telecia Hardy, Larry Johnson, Lula Mitchell, Thelma Petty-Cosey. Allstate Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (McWherter, James)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Johnson, Telecia Hardy, Larry Johnson, Lula Mitchell, Thelma Petty-Cosey. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (McWherter, James)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Erik D. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2863758, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Telecia Hardy, Joyce Johnson, Larry Johnson, Lula Mitchell, Thelma Petty-Cosey, Sarah Roberson, Maurice Williams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application of Erik D. Peterson, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Peterson, Erik)
August 27, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Erik D. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, GRANTING #8 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Snodgrass. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/23/2021. (mab)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION and APPLICATION for T. Joseph Snodgrass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2860056, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Snodgrass, Thomas)
August 20, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION and APPLICATION for T. Joseph Snodgrass to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by J. Brandon McWherter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/13/2021. (ktw)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION and APPLICATION for J. Brandon McWherter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2855036, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (McWherter, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp) Copy to Pltf
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 8/4/2021. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/04/2021. (cjr)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cjr)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-2849231, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, #3 Summons to Allstate Insurance Company, #4 Summons to Esurance Insurance Company) (Buckley, William) Modified docket text on 8/4/2021 (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Mitchell
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Johnson
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Petty-Cosey
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Roberson
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Williams
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telecia Hardy
Represented By: William Donald Buckley, III
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?