Hardy et al v. City Of Selma
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hardy, Toriano Neely and Kendall Thomas
Defendant: City Of Selma, Darrio Melton and Sean VanDiver
Case Number: 2:2021cv00522
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re: #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 01/20/2022. (cjr)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Morgan, Randall)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (mab)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re: #12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sean VanDiver, Darrio Melton. Plaintiffs' Response due by 2/9/2022. Defendants' reply due by 2/17/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/18/2022. (mab)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Darrio Melton, Sean VanDiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Morgan, Randall)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, GRANTING #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Melton to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, and EXTENDING deadline to 1/18/2022. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/30/2021. (mab)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Darrio Melton. (Morgan, Randall)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge Terry F. Moorer: Defendant's #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement, and #5 Plaintiffs' Conflict Disclosure Statement are NOTED. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (mab)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Darrio Melton, Sean VanDiver. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (McPhillips, Julian)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City Of Selma. (Morgan, Randall)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Hardy, Toriano Neely, Kendall Thomas. (Sawyer, Kyle)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/20/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Mag) (cmj)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by City Of Selma of Filing State Court Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal) (Morgan, Randall)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant City Of Selma. (Morgan, Randall)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-2915926, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by City Of Selma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morgan, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. City Of Selma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hardy
Represented By: Julian L. McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toriano Neely
Represented By: Julian L. McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Thomas
Represented By: Julian L. McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle David Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Selma
Represented By: Randall Morgan
Represented By: Paul Anthony Clark
Represented By: Reed Morgan Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrio Melton
Represented By: Paul Anthony Clark
Represented By: Reed Morgan Coleman
Represented By: Randall Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean VanDiver
Represented By: Randall Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?