Killough et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Douglas Killough and Alicia Killough
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00226
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order setting Scheduling Conference for 8/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins BY TELEPHONE. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/2/2022. (meh)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hedge, Robert)
August 1, 2022 REFERRAL OF #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (meh)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/15/2022. (meh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Hess, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Hess, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dallas County, Alabama, case number CV-2022-900070., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit B - Attorney's Valuation/Estimate Letter) (Hess, Mark)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3024540, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B- Attorney Valuation Letter/Estimate) (Hess, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killough et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Killough
Represented By: Robert J. Hedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Killough
Represented By: Robert J. Hedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Mark D. Hess
Represented By: Patrick J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?