McCarroll v. Tractor Supply Company
Plaintiff: Tracy McCarroll
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00307
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tracy McCarroll. (Compton, Louis)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #17 Response in Support of Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Townsley, Alexander)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Bivins. (fz)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tractor Supply Company. (Townsley, Alexander)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Jordan Townsley on behalf of Tractor Supply Company (Townsley, Alexander)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #15 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tracy McCarroll. Responses due by 9/25/2023. Replies due by 10/2/2023. Motion to be taken under submission on 10/3/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/11/2023. (fz)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Plaintiff's Brief in support of her Motion to Remand #11 filed by Tracy McCarroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Compton, Louis) Modified on 9/8/2023 (fz).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tracy McCarroll. (Compton, Louis)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #12 Plaintiff's Brief in support to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Tractor Supply Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement Doc. #8 filed by Defendant Tractor Supply Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal of the Magistrate Judge in this action. (bld)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Tractor Supply Company. (Pryor, Caroline)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order striking #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tractor Supply Company and ordering Defendant to re-file its corporate disclosure statement on this Court's current disclosure statement form by 8/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/16/23. (cmj)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/14/23. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate) (cjr)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Tractor Supply Company. (Pryor, Caroline)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/11/2023. (jil)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by Tractor Supply Company. (Pryor, Caroline)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3250809, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T) (Pryor, Caroline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarroll v. Tractor Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McCarroll
Represented By: L. Hunter Compton
Represented By: Robert H. Turner, Sr.
Represented By: John T. Stamps, III
Represented By: Louis Hunter Compton, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor T. Perry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Represented By: Alexander Jordan Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?