Timothy et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kammie Timothy and Jackie Timothy
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00002
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Baylous, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 1/22/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re 7 SEALED MOTION. The motion at docket 7 to file defendant's answer under seal is DENIED. It is plaintiffs' complaint which was not filed under seal rather than defendant's answer, which reveals significant health information regarding plaintiff Kammie Timothy. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Michael Baylous re 7 SEALED MOTION by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Baylous, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Notice of Removal)(Baylous, Michael)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Baylous, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Baylous, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Michael B. Baylous re #1 Notice of Removal by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Service)(Baylous, Michael)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company from Juneau, case number 1JU-18-01061CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2634756), filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Baylous, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kammie Timothy
Represented By: Larry Raymond Woolford
Represented By: Vance A. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Timothy
Represented By: Larry Raymond Woolford
Represented By: Vance A. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?