Southeast Alaska Conservation Council et al v. United States Forest Service et al

Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, National Audubon Society, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center for Biological Diversity and Southeast Alaska Conservation Council
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, Earl Stewart and David Schmid
Case Number: 1:2019cv00006
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Two Thumb Drives consisting of the Administrative Record received on 7/2/19 re #8 . Thumb drive is available conventionally for review at the Clerk's Office. A copy of the Administrative Record was forwarded to the chambers of Judge Gleason. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by All Defendants.(Norman, Erika)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lodging Administrative Record by David Schmid, Earl Stewart, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit AR Index)(Norman, Erika)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The joint motion at Docket #6 is GRANTED. administrative Record due 07/02/2019; Defendant's answer due 07/03/2019; plf's opening brief due 07/12/2019; Def's opposition due 08/12/2019; plf's reply due 08/23/2019. Plf's motion for preliminary injunction due 08/15/2019; opposition due 08/29/2019; reply due 09/06/2019. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/12/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order by David Schmid, Earl Stewart, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Norman, Erika)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Danielle Norman on behalf of All Defendants (Norman, Erika)
May 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to David Schmid, Earl Stewart, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant United States Forest Service, (Attachments: #1 United States Department of Agriculture, #2 David Schmid, #3 Earl Stewart, #4 U.S. Attorney General, #5 U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, Southeast Alaska Conservation Council. (Waldo, Thomas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Waldo, Thomas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Schmid, Earl Stewart, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2695259.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Southeast Alaska Conservation Council, Alaska Wilderness League, Defenders of Wildlife, National Audubon Society, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Forest Service, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Department of Agriculture, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant David Schmid, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Earl Stewart, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant William Barr, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bryan Schroder)(Waldo, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast Alaska Conservation Council et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Rainforest Defenders
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Audubon Society
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Alaska Conservation Council
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Olivia Elisabeth Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Stewart
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmid
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?