Eckle v. Alaska Riders, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Eckle
Defendant: Christopher Paulson and Alaska Riders, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM FOR INDEMNITY against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(Gutsch, Kenneth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alaska Riders, LLC, Christopher Paulson. (Gutsch, Kenneth)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Gutsch on behalf of All Defendants (Gutsch, Kenneth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint for Wrongfuld Death, Civil Cover Sheet, Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss served on Alaska Riders, LLC on August 31, 2019, filed by John Eckle. (Mejia, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint for Wrongfuld Death, Civil Cover Sheet served on Christopher Paulson on August 24, 2019, filed by John Eckle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service By Mail, Summons)(Mejia, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by John Eckle. (Mejia, John)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing an Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/21/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff to either file proofs of service by seven days from this order or file a status report. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for John Villagran Mejia as to Plainitff John Eckle. re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney JOHN V. MEJIA (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Alaska Riders, LLC, Christopher Paulson. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Riders, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Christopher Paulson)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney JOHN V. MEJIA by John Eckle.(Mejia, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Mejia, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alaska Riders, LLC, Christopher Paulson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2736962.), filed by John Eckle.(Mejia, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckle v. Alaska Riders, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Paulson
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Riders, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eckle
Represented By: John Villagran Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?