MacDonald v. The University of Alaska et al
Plaintiff: Daniel McDonald and Daniel MacDonald
Defendant: Sara Childress, The University of Alaska, Sean McCarthy, Chase Parkey and Jon Tillinghast
Case Number: 1:2020cv00001
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report) (CFR, Chambers Staff)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/22/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED filed by Daniel MacDonald. (Altman, Keith)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean McCarthy, Sara Childress, The University of Alaska, Jon Tillinghast, Chase Parkey. All Defendants. (O'Brien, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess pages at Docket #14 is GRANTED. The Court accepts Defendants' Response in Opposition at Docket #15 in full as filed. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Sara Childress re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Sara Childress, Sean McCarthy, Chase Parkey, The University of Alaska, Jon Tillinghast. (O'Brien, Michael)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED filed by Sara Childress, Sean McCarthy, Chase Parkey, The University of Alaska, Jon Tillinghast. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Michael)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Sara Childress, Sean McCarthy, Chase Parkey, The University of Alaska, Jon Tillinghast. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Michael)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED. Plaintiff's requests for a temporary retraining order and for expedited oral argument are DENIED. Defendants shall file their response to the motion for a preliminary injunction no later than 14 days from the date of the order. Plaintiff may file a reply no later than 7 days after the filing of Defendants' response. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/21/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward O'Brien on behalf of All Defendants (O'Brien, Michael)
April 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED by Daniel McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Altman, Keith)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/17/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to Sara Childress, Sean McCarthy, Chase Parkey, The University of Alaska, Jon Tillinghast. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 Unissued summons re Defendant The University of Alaska, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Sara Childress, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Sean McCarthy, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Chase Parkey, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Jon Tillinghast)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney, at docket #3 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint, #6 MOTION, and #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. A review of the document submitted at dkt 1, 4, and 6 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 1, 4, and 6. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED Judicial Notice by Daniel McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Altman, Keith)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 ERRATA Proposed Order to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Daniel McDonald #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED filed by Daniel McDonald. (Altman, Keith)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED by Daniel McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Altman, Keith)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Keith Altman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2864585.) by Daniel McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Keith Altman)(Altman, Keith)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Altman, Keith)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2864181.), filed by Daniel McDonald.(Altman, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacDonald v. The University of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Childress
Represented By: Michael Edward O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Alaska
Represented By: Michael Edward O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McCarthy
Represented By: Michael Edward O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Parkey
Represented By: Michael Edward O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Tillinghast
Represented By: Michael Edward O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McDonald
Represented By: Keith Louis Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel MacDonald
Represented By: Keith Louis Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?