McCrumb v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jay Carlton McCrumb
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00005
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #8 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: agency record due within 60 days, opening brief due 30 days, responsive brief 30 days, reply brief 14 days. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/10/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Carlton McCrumb. Andrew M. Saul served on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Eaglin, Paul)
July 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/22/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jay Carlton McCrumb.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Jay Carlton McCrumb.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrumb v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Carlton McCrumb
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?