Anderson et al v. Juneau Emergency Medical Associates et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Ann Anderson and Marian Adams
Defendant: Juneau Emergency Medical Associates, United States of America and City & Borough of Juneau/Bartlett Regional Hospital
3Rd Party Defendant: Travis K. Aceveda
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Juneau Emergency Medical Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00010
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery closes 2/21/2022. Dispositive Motions deadline 3/21/2022. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/4/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH against City & Borough of Juneau/Bartlett Regional Hospital, Juneau Emergency Medical Associates, United States of America, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Choate, Mark)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Choate, Mark)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 2019 (12) December 24 (1) Complaint for Medical Malpractice, #2 2019 (12) December 24 (2) Summons and Notice of Judicial Assignment, #3 2020 (1) January 29 Demand for Jury Trial, #4 2020 (2) February 7 (1) Return of Service, #5 2020 (2) February 7 (2) Entry of Appearance - Chester Gilmore, #6 2020 (2) February 7 (3) Demand for Jury Trial_001, #7 2020 (2) February 7 (4) Acceptance of Service & Waiver of Process, #8 2020 (2) February 18 (1) Entry of Appearance (Donna Meyers), #9 2020 (2) February 18 (2) Demand for Jury Trial (CBJ & Bartlett), #10 2020 (2) February 25 Answer to Complaint (CBJ & Bartlett), #11 2020 (3) Mar 18 JEMA Answer to Complaint, #12 2020 (3) March 26 Ntc of Mutual Agreement to Accept, #13 2020 (4) April 7 Notice of Administrative Judicial Reassignment, #14 2020 (4) April 8 Notice of Pretrial Scheduling Conference, #15 2020 (5) May 22 Status Memo re Report of Parties Planning Mtg, #16 2020 (6) June 22 Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #17 2020 (8) August 6 Motion to Amend Complaint, #18 2020 (8) August 7 (1) Plaintiff's Preliminary Witness List, #19 2020 (8) August 7 (2) CBJ & Bartlett Preliminary Witness List, #20 2020 (8) August 7 (3) CBJ Motion to Join Necessary Parties, #21 2020 (8) August 10 (1) Notice of Filing Signed Affidavit, #22 2020 (8) August 10 (2) Motion for Leave File 3rd Party Complaint, #23 2020 (8) August 10 (3) JEMA Preliminary Witness List, #24 2020 (8) August 17 (1) Qualified Non-Opposition to JEMA Motion, #25 2020 (8) August 17 (2) Qualified Non-Opposition to BRH Motion, #26 2020 (8) August 17 (3) BRH Qualified Non-Opp to Plaintiff Motion, #27 2020 (8) August 24 (1) JEMA Joinder to BRH Qualified Non-Opp, #28 2020 (8) August 24 (2) CBJ Reply Plaintiff Non-Opp to Motion #2, #29 2020 (8) August 24 (3) Order Granting CBJ Joinder Motion, #30 2020 (9) September 9 (1) Order Granting BRH Mtn to Amend Complaint, #31 2020 (9) September 9 (2) Order Granting JEMA Motion for Leave, #32 2020 (9) September 9 (3) First Amended Complaint, #33 2020 (9) September 9 (4) JEMA 3rd Party Complaint, #34 2020 (9) September 21 Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Beausang, Seth)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 SLG TEXT ORDER: The United States of Americas Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Lodge State Court Documents at docket #10 is GRANTED. The state court documents shall be filed no later than 10/22/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court Documents (Unopposed) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beausang, Seth)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer at docket #8 is GRANTED. The defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the First Amended Complaint #1 no later than 11/13/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beausang, Seth)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/22/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by United States of America (Beausang, Seth)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 1JU-19-01014 CI (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/18/2020 to reflect docket text and duplicate filing: see 9/18/20 Docket Annotation below (PXS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2020: #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint) (PXS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2020 to replaced Main Document 1 and Attachment 1, add Attachment 2, correct docket text, and regenerated NEF (PXS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Docket Annotation: The parties are advised that the wrong PDF document was originally attached to docket #1 . The parties are advised the error has been corrected and the Notice of Electronic Filing for docket #1 has been regenerated. The parties are further advised that the filing at docket #3 Notice of Removal, is a duplicate filing to the one at docket #1 and should be disregarded as duplicate. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Juneau Emergency Medical Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Ann Anderson
Represented By: Mark C. Choate
Represented By: Jon Michael Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Adams
Represented By: Mark C. Choate
Represented By: Jon Michael Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juneau Emergency Medical Associates
Represented By: Chester DeMott Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Seth M. Beausang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & Borough of Juneau/Bartlett Regional Hospital
Represented By: Donna M. Meyers
Represented By: Megan J. Costello
Represented By: Howard A. Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travis K. Aceveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Juneau Emergency Medical Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Chester DeMott Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?