Organized Village of Kake et al v. Perdue et al
Plaintiff: The Boat Company, National Audubon Society, The Wilderness Society, Alaska Wilderness League, Organized Village of Kake, Uncruise, Women's Earth and Climate Action Network, Friends of the Earth, Ketchikan Indian Association, Organized Village of Saxman, Hoonah Indian Association, National Wildlife Federation, Center for Biological Diversity, Klawock Coorperation Association, Greenpeace, Inc., Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Sierra Club, Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association, Defenders of Wildlife, Natural Resources Defense Council, Southeast alaska Conservation Council, Environment America, Ketchikan Indian Community and Klawock Cooperative Association
Defendant: United States Forest Service, Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture and Stephen Censky
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/13/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Danielle Norman on behalf of All Defendants (Norman, Erika)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence, at docket #6 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Garett R. Rose, at docket #5 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGE HOLLAND TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is hereby reassigned to Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 1:20-cv-00011-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Jorgensen on behalf of Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Friends of the Earth, Greenpeace, Inc., Hoonah Indian Association, Ketchikan Indian Association, Klawock Coorperation Association, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Organized Village of Kake, Organized Village of Saxman, Sierra Club, Southeast alaska Conservation Council, The Boat Company, The Wilderness Society, Uncruise, Women's Earth and Climate Action Network (Jorgensen, Eric)
December 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2992819.) by Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Friends of the Earth, Greenpeace, Inc., Hoonah Indian Association, Ketchikan Indian Association, Klawock Coorperation Association, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Organized Village of Kake, Organized Village of Saxman, Sierra Club, Southeast alaska Conservation Council, The Boat Company, The Wilderness Society, Uncruise, Women's Earth and Climate Action Network.(Lawrence, Nathaniel)
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Garett R. Rose. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2992816.) by Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Friends of the Earth, Greenpeace, Inc., Hoonah Indian Association, Ketchikan Indian Association, Klawock Coorperation Association, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Organized Village of Kake, Organized Village of Saxman, Sierra Club, Southeast alaska Conservation Council, The Boat Company, The Wilderness Society, Uncruise, Women's Earth and Climate Action Network.(Rose, Garett)
December 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to Stephen Censky, Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant W. Barr, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Perdue, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Rosen, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Schroder, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant USDA, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant USFS, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Censky)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Friends of the Earth, Greenpeace, Inc., Hoonah Indian Association, Ketchikan Indian Association, Klawock Coorperation Association, National Audubon Society, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Organized Village of Kake, Organized Village of Saxman, Sierra Club, Southeast alaska Conservation Council, The Boat Company, The Wilderness Society, Uncruise, Women's Earth and Climate Action Network. (Glover, Katharine)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Glover, Katharine)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Censky, Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--2992720.), filed by Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association, Women's Earth and Climate Action Network, Sierra Club, National Wildlife Federation, Friends of the Earth, Klawock Coorperation Association, Organized Village of Kake, The Wilderness Society, Ketchikan Indian Association, Uncruise, The Boat Company, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, National Audubon Society, Hoonah Indian Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Alaska Wilderness League, Environment America, Alaska Rainforest Defenders, Southeast alaska Conservation Council, Greenpeace, Inc., Organized Village of Saxman.(Glover, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organized Village of Kake et al v. Perdue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Boat Company
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Audubon Society
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organized Village of Kake
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uncruise
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women's Earth and Climate Action Network
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ketchikan Indian Association
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organized Village of Saxman
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoonah Indian Association
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klawock Coorperation Association
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Rainforest Defenders
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Longline Fishermen's Association
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast alaska Conservation Council
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environment America
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ketchikan Indian Community
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klawock Cooperative Association
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Censky
Represented By: Erika Danielle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?