Laurenzana v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Julia Laurenzana
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00013
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Laurenzana. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dellert, Christopher) Modified on 8/12/2021 to correct service date. (RMC, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/26/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Constance Scheperle on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Scheperle, Marie)
July 19, 2021 Docket Annotation: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration substituted for Andrew Saul (Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration) pursuant to FRCvP 25(d) (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk to issue summons. Answer due 60 days after receipt. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/14/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2021 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher H. Dellert, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3099100.) by Julia Laurenzana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant OGC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant USAG, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant USAO)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Julia Laurenzana (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Julia Laurenzana.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Julia Laurenzana.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurenzana v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Laurenzana
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Marie Constance Scheperle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?