Bennett et al v. Weldon et al
Plaintiff: Heather Bennett, James Barrett, Amy Breaux, Nathan Carey, Kenny Knapp, Patricia Morgan, Rik Pruett and Jessica Warmbrodt
Defendant: Beth Weldon, Michelle Bonnet Hale, Wade Bryson, Waahlaal Giidaak Barbara Blake, Marie Gladziszewsi, Alicia Hughes-Skandijs, Greg Smith, Carole Triem and Christine Woll
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed and ACCEPTS the parties Notice Regarding Settlement at Docket #8 . Case closing documents or a further status report shall be filed no later than May 18, 2022. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding Settlement by James Barrett, Heather Bennett, Amy Breaux, Nathan Carey, Kenny Knapp, Patricia Morgan, Rik Pruett, Jessica Warmbrodt (Stone, Stacey)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel re #6 Amended Complaint. A review of the document submitted at dkt 6 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 6. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Stone, Stacey)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 JWS TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been randomly reassigned to the Hon. Sharon L. Gleason. Henceforth the case number will be 1:22-cv-00002-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 HRH TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge John W. Sedwick for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 1:22-cv-00002-JWS. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Beth Weldon, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Carole Triem, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Alicia Hughes-Skandijs, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Christine Woll, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Greg Smith, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Maria Gladziszewsi, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michelle Bonnet Hale, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant Waahlaal Giidaak Barbara Blake, #8 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wade Bryson)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Stone, Stacey)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3212186.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Stone, Stacey)
February 25, 2022 Summons Issued as to Waahlaal Giidaak Barbara Blake, Wade Bryson, Marie Gladziszewsi, Michelle Bonnet Hale, Alicia Hughes-Skandijs, Greg Smith, Carole Triem, Beth Weldon, Christine Woll. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Weldon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Bennett
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Barrett
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Breaux
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Carey
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Knapp
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Morgan
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rik Pruett
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Warmbrodt
Represented By: Stacey C. Stone
Represented By: Stacey C Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Bonnet Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waahlaal Giidaak Barbara Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Gladziszewsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Hughes-Skandijs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Triem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Woll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?