The United States of America v. The State of Alaska et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: The State of Alaska, The Alaska Department of Fish & Game and Doug Vincent-Lang
Petitioner: Ahtna Tene Nene and Ahtna, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission, Association of Village Council Presidents, Betty Magnuson and Ivan M Ivan
Case Number: 1:2022cv00054
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Intervene State of Alaska's Opposition to AHTNA TENE NENE & AHTNA, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene filed by The State of Alaska. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/13/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Ivan M Ivan, Association of Village Council Presidents, Betty Magnuson.(Newman, Matthew)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 State of Alaska's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, The Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission's Complaint in Intervention by All Defendants.(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Notice to Counsel re #38 MOTION to Intervene filed by Ahtna Tene Nene. A review of the document submitted at dkt 38 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 38. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation re #38 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs: The parties are advised that the role of the proposed Intervenor Plaintiffs has been changed from Intervenor Plaintiffs to Movant until the Motion to Intervene has been decided. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene by Ahtna Tene Nene and Ahtna, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in Intervention, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Ahtna Motion-Intervene)(Crary, Anna) Modified on 7/5/2022 to correct filers. (RMC, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Intervene. Complaint in Intervention to be filed within 7 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/1/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #19 MOTION to Intervene Response to the Association of Village Council Presidents' Motion to Intervene filed by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/23/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings; Partial Transcript of Oral Argument on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (DKT 5) held on June 21, 2022 before Judge Sharon L. Gleason. Realtime Court Reporter: Sonja L. Reeves, RDR-CRR. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction or correction purposes may purchase a copy by calling Realtime Court Reporter, Sonja L. Reeves, RDR-CRR (907) 677-6136. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Motion Requesting Redactions or Corrections of this transcript. If no such motion is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redactions or corrections after Release of Transcript Restriction deadline of 9/20/2022. Ordered by: Sharon L. Gleason (SLR)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 State of Alaska's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang.(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Presented at Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by The United States of America re #31 Motion Hearing,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit federal order dated June 18, #2 Exhibit state order dated June 18, #3 Exhibit KRSWG June 15 meeting summary)(Turcke, Paul)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Sharon L. Gleason: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (dkt 5) held 10:04 a.m. to 10:57 a.m. on 6/21/2022. Court and counsel heard re plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 . Exhibits admitted. Mr. Turcke to docket exhibits by c.o.b. 6/21/2022. Arguments heard. Matter TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; written ruling to issue. APPEARANCES: Paul A. Turcke, PLT; Nathaniel Amdur-Clark, intervenor-PLT; Aaron Christian Peterson, DEF; Margaret A. Paton-Walsh, DEF; Sonja L. Reeves, Official Court Reporter. EXHIBIT LIST attached as main document. (ACW, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Intervene Opposition to KRIFTC'S Joinder in Plaintiff United States of America's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret) Modified on 6/22/2022 to link to dkt 5. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE KUSKOKWIM RIVER INTER-TRIBAL FISH COMMISSION'S MOTION TO INTERVENE: granting #12 Motion to Intervene. Defendants mayrespond to the Commission's filings with respect to a preliminary injunction by 3:00 p.m. on June 20, 2022. Oral argument on the motion for a preliminary injunction has been scheduled for June 21, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 3. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/17/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SLG TEXT ORDER: The State of Alaskas Motion to File an Overlength Opposition at Docket #16 is GRANTED. The response in opposition at Docket #17 is ACCEPTED as filed. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SLG TEXT ORDER: Oral argument set for 6/21/2022 at 10:00 a.m. re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction will now be held in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. (RMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/17/2022 to include Anchorage. NEF regenerated.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission. (Amdur-Clark, Nathaniel)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion at Docket #22 is GRANTED. The Reply at Docket #21 is ACCEPTED as filed. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINDER TO MOTION by Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission #21 Reply to Response to Motion filed by The United States of America. (Amdur-Clark, Nathaniel)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Intervene Partial Opposition to KRITFC's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff filed by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (Peterson, Aaron)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turcke, Paul)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Combined Memorandum in Support filed by The United States of America. (Turcke, Paul)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice to Counsel re #19 MOTION to Intervene filed by Ivan M Ivan, Betty Magnuson, Association of Village Council Presidents. A review of the document submitted at dkt 19 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 19. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation re #19 Motion to Intervene as Intervenor Plaintiff: The parties are advised that the role of the proposed Intervenor Plaintiff has been changed from Intervenor Plaintiff to Movant until the Motion to Intervene has been decided. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene by Association of Village Council Presidents, Betty Magnuson, Ivan M Ivan. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Complaint in Intervention, #3 Declaration of Korthuis, #4 Declaration of Magnuson, #5 Declaration of Ivan, #6 Proposed Order)(Newman, Matthew)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond at Docket #15 is GRANTED. The response to the complaint shall be filed no later than June 21, 2022. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Combined Memorandum in Support Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Delegation of Authority Letter from FSB (2018), #2 Exhibit F - MOU, #3 Exhibit G - Appendix | MOU Comprehensive Conservative Plan)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion to File an Overlength Opposition by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the Motion to File an Overlength Opposition)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Respond by The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting The State's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINDER TO MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Mike Williams Sr.)(Amdur-Clark, Nathaniel) Modified on 6/8/2022 to create relationship to dkt 5.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by The United States of America. (Turcke, Paul)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation re #12 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff: The parties are advised that the role of the proposed Intervenor Plaintiff has been changed from Intervenor Plaintiff to Movant until the Motion to Intervene has been decided. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit Attachment A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Attachment B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Attachment C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Attachment D to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Attachment E to Complaint, #7 Proposed Order)(Amdur-Clark, Nathaniel)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Expedited Consideration Requested). Defendants' response to #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 6/7/2022, replies due 6/14/2022. Oral argument on #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 6/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/31/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Expedited Consideration Requested) filed by The United States of America. (Turcke, Paul)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Expedited Consideration Requested) Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by The State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit C-5)(Peterson, Aaron)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Expedite. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by close of business 5/27/2022. Plaintiff may file a reply by 5:00pm on 5/28/2022. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/25/2022. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Turcke, Paul)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Expedited Consideration Requested) by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turcke, Paul)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Combined Memorandum in Support by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Blihovde Decl., #2 Exhibit Thiele Decl., #3 Proposed Order)(Turcke, Paul)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Christian Peterson on behalf of The State of Alaska (Peterson, Aaron)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General of Alaska, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Doug Vincent-Lang)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTION RELIEF against The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to The Alaska Department of Fish & Game, The State of Alaska, Doug Vincent-Lang. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. The State of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alaska
Represented By: Aaron Christian Peterson
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alaska Department of Fish & Game
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Vincent-Lang
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kuskokwim River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission
Represented By: Nathaniel Amdur-Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Association of Village Council Presidents
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Betty Magnuson
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ivan M Ivan
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ahtna Tene Nene
Represented By: Anna C Crary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ahtna, Inc.
Represented By: Anna C Crary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?