Elisoff v. Lundquist et al
Plaintiff: Erica Elisoff
Defendant: Detective Lundquist, Sergeant Bronsen, City of Juneau, M.D. Blaise Bellows, Detective Carl Lundquist, Sergeant Dominic Branson and City and Borough of Juneau
Case Number: 1:2023cv00013
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Erica Elisoff.(Chaloupka, Maren)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff will please secure an answer from Dr. Bellows or apply for the default of Dr. Bellows on or before January 9, 2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Caption. The case caption of the above matter is amended to reflect the full and correct names of defendants City and Borough of Juneau; Detective Carl Lundquist; and Sergeant Dominic Branson. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/22/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Elisoff. Blaise Bellows served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Chaloupka, Maren)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Elisoff. Detective Lundquist served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Chaloupka, Maren)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Elisoff. City of Juneau served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Chaloupka, Maren)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Elisoff. Sergeant Bronsen served on 11/30/2023, answer due 12/21/2023. (Chaloupka, Maren)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re Proof of Service. On or before December 22, 2023, plaintiff will please file proof of service of the complaint on defendant Blaise Bellows, M.D. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Limited Entry of Appearance by Sergeant Bronsen, Detective Lundquist (Mitchell, Clinton)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Barnum Mitchell on behalf of City of Juneau (Mitchell, Clinton)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Sergeant Bronsen, Detective Lundquist.(Mitchell, Clinton)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption by City of Juneau.(Mitchell, Clinton)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Juneau.(Mitchell, Clinton)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant M.D. Blaise Bellows, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Sergeant Bronsen, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant City of Juneau, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Detective Lundquist)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2023 Summons Issued as to Blaise Bellows, Sergeant Bronsen, City of Juneau, Detective Lundquist. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Case Status. Plaintiff will please secure the issuance of summonses and file proofs of service of the complaint without delay. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maren Lynn Chaloupka, at docket #2 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
October 31, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Harber, Amanda)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Maren Lynn Chaloupka. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3517732.) by Erica Elisoff.(Harber, Amanda)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3517719.), filed by Erica Elisoff.(Harber, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elisoff v. Lundquist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Elisoff
Represented By: Amanda Joy Harber
Represented By: Maren Lynn Chaloupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Lundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Bronsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Juneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Blaise Bellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Carl Lundquist
Represented By: Clinton Barnum Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dominic Branson
Represented By: Clinton Barnum Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and Borough of Juneau
Represented By: Clinton Barnum Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?