Barry v. Shell Oil Company et al
Plaintiff: Blane Barry
Defendant: Shell Oil Company, Arctia Offshore, Ltd., Safety Management Systems LLC and Shell Offshore, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00004
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Office: Nome Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 172 Motion for Summary Judgment. See document. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/25/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/21/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/22/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/20/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Compel. While Arctia has provided notice as to the person who will be performing the IME, it has not provided the other information required under Rule 35(a)(2)(B). Arctia is directed to file a notice within fourteen days of this order as to the time, place, manner, conditions, and scope of the examination. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/3/17. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Change Venue. The pre-trial hearings, trial, and post-trial hearings will be held at the Anchorage courthouse. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 1/11/17. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 78 Partial Motion to Dismiss; plf's clms angst SMS dism w/o prej; SMS remains a pty due to xclm. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/5/16. (PRR, COURT STAFF)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Strike demand for jury trial. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/30/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry v. Shell Oil Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blane Barry
Represented By: Jack G. Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arctia Offshore, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Management Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Offshore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?