Menadelook v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Menadelook
Defendant: Thomas W. Wonderlich, Jonathon N. Schumaker, Richard M. Kaut, United States of America and Michael Scott
Case Number: 2:2021cv00001
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard M. Kaut.(Tiemessen, John)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 TMB TEXT ORDER: The unopposed #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED. The claims against the United States are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 TMB TEXT ORDER: Good cause appearing, the #9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Richard M. Kaut, M.D. shall file his response to the Complaint on or before June 17, 2021 at 5:00 PM AKDT. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2021 (01) Jan 13 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2021 (02) Feb 18 Summons Schumaker, Scott, Kaut, Wonderlich, MD, #3 Exhibit 2021 (05) May 03 Affidavit of Service upon Jonathon N. Schumaker, MD, #4 Exhibit 2021 (05) May 03 Entry of Appearance for DFDTs - Clinton M. Campion, #5 Exhibit 2021 (05) May 04 Non-Opposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File, #6 Exhibit 2021 (05) May 10 Order Granting Extension to File Answer by 6-17-2021, #7 Exhibit 2021 (05) May 12 Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Traini, Jacquelyn)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without Prejudice filed by Joshua Menadelook. (Johnson, Douglas)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard M. Kaut. (Tiemessen, John)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tiemessen on behalf of Richard M. Kaut (Tiemessen, John)
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To File Response To Plaintiff's Complaint by Richard M. Kaut. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion To Extend Time to File Response To Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A 1 of 3)(Tiemessen, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by United States of America (Traini, Jacquelyn)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Meredith Torres re #6 Memorandum, by United States of America. (Traini, Jacquelyn)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support by United States of America #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without Prejudice filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 2021-0199 Menadelook, Joshua, Indiv. And as Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Eli Menadelook, Jr., Dec'd SF 95_Redacted, #2 Exhibit B- 2021-0200 Menadelook, Joshua obo Brianna Nicole Menadelook, Minor SF 95_Redacted)(Traini, Jacquelyn)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without Prejudice by United States of America.(Traini, Jacquelyn)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from State of Alaska Second Judicial District, case number 2NO-21-00008-CI., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Certificaton)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menadelook v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Menadelook
Represented By: Douglas G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Wonderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon N. Schumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Kaut
Represented By: John J. Tiemessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jacquelyn A. Traini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?