Holger et al v. Gleason et al
Plaintiff: Louis Holger and The Alaska Native Children & Families
Defendant: Sharon L. Gleason, Jonas M. Walker, Bryan Schroder, Matthew McCreary Scoble, Timothy Mark Burgess, Ryan Thompson, Joshua J. Rongitsch, United States of America Inc., United States Department of Justice Inc., Federal Reserve System, Inc., State of Alaska Inc, State of Alaska Office of Children's Services Inc, Veronica P. Driskill, Karen D. Morrison, Karly D. Shoenhair, State of Alaska Office of the Attorney General Inc., Carla R. Erickson`, Vennie E. Nemecek, Laura S. Hartz, State of Alaska Department of Public Safety Inc., Eric M. Taylor, State of Alaska Office of Public Advocacy Inc, Paul F. McDermott, State of Alaska Department of Corrections Inc., Alaska Court System Inc., Eric A. Aarseth, Sidney Billingslea, William Martin Walker, Michael J. Dunleavy and Nicole Norma Stoops
Case Number: 2:2022cv00001
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Transfer; Change of Address by Louis Holger. (SXH, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2022 Filing 21 JUDGMENT: case dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal constitutes a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman on 3/7/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: granting #6 Motion for Screening. Complaint dismissed with prejudice; the Clerk of Court is directed to no longer accept Holgers filings without pre-screening and approval from the Court or prepayment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman on 3/7/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 15, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplemental Certificate of Service by Jonas M. Walker re #15 Reply to Response to Motion, #11 Notice (Other) (Fonstad, John)
February 14, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Transfer and Change of Address by Louis Holger. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2022 Filing 17 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Louis Holger re #12 , #13 . Service on the NEF for the returned mail entry will not be distributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 9, 2022 Filing 16 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Louis Holger re #14 . Service on the NEF for the returned mail entry will not be distributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Screening (28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2) & (g)) filed by Jonas M. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court docket, Holger v US)(Fonstad, John)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Screening (28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2) & (g)) filed by Louis Holger. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/DESIGNATION OF A DISTRICT JUDGE: Judge Marsha J. Pechman from the Western District of Washington appointed. Signed by Mary H. Murguia on 1/31/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING DESIGNATION of Hon. Sam E. Haddon. Signed by Mary H. Murguia on 1/24/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Opposition to Motion to Remand by Jonas M. Walker re #10 Notice (Other) (Fonstad, John)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 OBJECTION TO FALSE CLAIM OF "CIVIL ACTION", "CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATION", AND "IMMUNITY" by Louis Holger re #1 Notice of Removal, (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 26, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS JONAS M. WALKER & TIMOTHY MARK BURGESS PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. RULE 4 by Louis Holger (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/DESIGNATION OF A DISTRICT JUDGE: Judge Sam E. Haddon from the District of Montana appointed. Signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 1/19/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 JWS TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: The assigned judge recuses. This case has been re-assigned to Hon. Sam E. Haddon. The case number will be 2:22-cv-00001-SEH. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Screening (28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2) & (g)) by Jonas M. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents - Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Holger v Colbath, 19-cv-4 - dct dismissal, #3 Exhibit B- Native Vill Kotz v Walker, 17-cv-265 - complaint, #4 Exhibit C- Native Vill Kotz v Walker, 17-cv-265 - dct dismissal, #5 Exhibit D- We the People v USA, 18-cv-10 - complaint, #6 Exhibit E- We the People v USA, 18-cv-10 - dct dismissal, #7 Exhibit F- Holger v Gleason, 18-cv-79 - dct dismissal, #8 Exhibit G- Holger v State of Alaska Inc, 20-35966 - CTA9 dismissal-flat, #9 Exhibit H- Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-166 - complaint, #10 Exhibit I- Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-166 - dct dismissal, #11 Exhibit J- Holger v USA, 18-cv-241 - complaint, #12 Exhibit K- Holger v USA, 18-cv-241 - dct dismissal, #13 Exhibit L- Holger v USA, 18-cv-241 - CTA9 dismissal- flat, #14 Exhibit M- Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-277 - complaint, #15 Exhibit N- Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-277 - dct dismissal, #16 Exhibit O-Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-277 - CTA9 dismissal- flat, #17 Exhibit P- Holger v Phillips, 18-cv-284 - complaint, #18 Exhibit Q- Holger v Phillips, 18-cv-284 - dct dismissal, #19 Exhibit R- Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-287 - complaint, #20 Exhibit S- Holger v Burgess, 18-cv-287 - dct dismissal, #21 Exhibit T- Holger v City of Kotz 19-cv-4 - complaint, #22 Exhibit U- Holger v City of Kotz 19-cv-4 - dct dismissal, #23 Exhibit V- Holger v City of Kotz 19-cv-4 - CTA9 dismissal- flat, #24 Exhibit W- Holger v Colbath, 19-cv-4 - state ct complaint, #25 Exhibit X- Holger v Colbath, 19-cv-4 - CTA9 dismissal- flat, #26 Exhibit Y- USA v Holger, 18-cr-35 - indictment, #27 Exhibit Z- USA v Holger, 18-cr-35 - verdict form, #28 Exhibit AA- USA v Holger, 18-cr-35 - denial order, #29 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Jonas M. Walker (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 1-1, #4 Attachment 2, #5 Attachment 3, #6 Attachment 4, #7 Attachment 5, #8 Attachment 6, #9 Attachment 7, #10 Attachment 8, #11 Attachment 9, #12 Attachment 10, #13 Attachment 11, #14 Attachment 12, #15 Attachment 13, #16 Summonses to all Parties, #17 Notice of Recusal and Reassignment, #18 Notice to Parties re Future Filings Nome, #19 Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Fonstad, John)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Jonas M. Walker (Fonstad, John)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Louis Holger, Jonas M. Walker from State of Alaska, Second Judicial District, case number 2KB-21-00264 CI., filed by Louis Holger, Jonas M. Walker. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 1-1, #4 Att 2, #5 Att 3, #6 Att 4, #7 Att 5, #8 Att 6, #9 Att 7, #10 Att 8, #11 Att 9, #12 Att 10, #13 Att 11, #14 Att 12, #15 Att 13)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holger et al v. Gleason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Holger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alaska Native Children & Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonas M. Walker
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew McCreary Scoble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Mark Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua J. Rongitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Office of Children's Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica P. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen D. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karly D. Shoenhair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Office of the Attorney General Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla R. Erickson`
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vennie E. Nemecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura S. Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Department of Public Safety Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Office of Public Advocacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Department of Corrections Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Court System Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Aarseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Billingslea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Martin Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Dunleavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Norma Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?