Poong Lim/Pert Joint Venture Ex Rel v. Dick Pacific/Ghemm Joint Venture et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv00290
Filed: January 5, 2006
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2006 263 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion in Limine
March 2, 2006 261 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
February 22, 2006 256 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Reconsideration
February 8, 2006 252 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
January 5, 2006 251 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion in Limine

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poong Lim/Pert Joint Venture Ex Rel v. Dick Pacific/Ghemm Joint Venture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?