Adams Jr. et al v. Teck Cominco Alaska Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv00049
Filed: March 8, 2004
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2008 335 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion in Limine
March 10, 2008 303 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion in Limine
February 27, 2008 276 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
July 28, 2006 136 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
February 3, 2006 127 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Summary Judgment

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams Jr. et al v. Teck Cominco Alaska Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?