Valerie Rountree et al v. Ching Feng Blinds et al

Plaintiff: The Estate of April Lynn Cox, Morgan Schediwy, Valerie Rountree and Christopher Cox
Defendant: Window Covering Manufacturers Association
Case Number: 3:2004cv00112
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
September 10, 2007 148 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Expedite
December 29, 2006 122 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Compel
November 9, 2006 111 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
June 30, 2006 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, Set Deadlines

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerie Rountree et al v. Ching Feng Blinds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of April Lynn Cox
Represented By: Don C. Bauermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Schediwy
Represented By: Don C. Bauermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Rountree
Represented By: Don C. Bauermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cox
Represented By: Don C. Bauermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Window Covering Manufacturers Association
Represented By: Jameson B. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?