USA v. Kott et al

Case Number: 3:2007cr00056
Filed: August 1, 2007
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2011 534 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Reconsideration
March 15, 2011 493 Opinion or Order of the Court Report and Recommendation
November 3, 2010 472 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, Set Deadlines
January 13, 2010 429 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion to Dismiss
November 8, 2007 285 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Acquittal
September 10, 2007 229 Opinion or Order of the Court Order
September 4, 2007 208 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion in Limine
August 29, 2007 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Order
August 28, 2007 165 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
August 14, 2007 108 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
August 1, 2007 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Motion for Change of Venue, Order on Motion for Hearing

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Kott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?