E-Terra, LLC v. SARS Corporation et al

Plaintiff: E-Terra, LLC
Defendant: SARS Corporation and Secure Asset Reporting Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00123
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 81 Motion to Compel. DENIED without prejudice to a subsequent motion to compel to be brought within 21 days following a sincere and meaningful effort to resolve the discovery dispute. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/18/10. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 3, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/3/10. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 2, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion in Limine; denying 61 Motion in Limine; denying 64 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/2/10. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 27, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Compel subject to the parties' agreement on and filing of a protective order concerning the Tracpoint software within three (3) weeks from the date of this order. If the parties are unable to agree upon and file a p rotective order within that time, each party shall file a separate proposed protective order with the court within four (4) weeks from the date of this order, and the court will choose one of the two proposed orders to govern production of the Tracpoint software. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/27/09. (GMM, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E-Terra, LLC v. SARS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-Terra, LLC
Represented By: Clyde Hutchins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Asset Reporting Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?