Dietzmann et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Cherry Dietzmann, J. A., II and D. A.
Defendant: United States of America, United States Marshal's Office, Kevin Guinn and John Olson, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00019
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Timothy M. Burgess
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2010 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON UNITED STATES' OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE CREATURA'S DECEMBER 3, 2010, ORDER. The United States' Motion for Expedited Review (Dkt. 227 ) is GRANTED; the United States' Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) Objection to Magistrate Judge Creatura's Order (Dkt. 226 ) is OVERRULED; The Order RE: Settlement Conference (Dkt. 222 ) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 12/7/10. (Lemm, J.)
November 17, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND VARIOUS OTHER MOTIONS, granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 107 Motion ; denying 126 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 130 Motion for Summ ary Judgment; granting 146 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 158 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 163 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 11/17/10. (Lemm, J.)
September 23, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND PROCEDURAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 9/23/10. (Lemm, J.)
February 22, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR RULE OF LAW ON APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT OF JASON ANDERSON, SR., granting 39 & 47 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 2/22/10. (Lemm, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietzmann et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Dietzmann
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. A., II
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. A.
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshal's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Olson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?