May v. F/V Lorena Marie, O.N. 939683 et al

Plaintiff: Raymond May
Defendant: F/V Lorena Marie, O.N. 939683, James Skonberg and Jane Doe Skonberg
Case Number: 3:2009cv00114
Filed: June 4, 2009
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Referring Judge: John D. Roberts
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER granting Motion 74 for Reconsideration of Order filed at Docket 73. The Court finds that the Defendant shall compensate Plaintiff for fees in the amount of $1,240.00 for attorney Brennan, costs in the amount of $514.28 f or attorney Brennan, fees in the amount of $14,105.20 for attorney Gibbons and costs in the amount of $1,277.98 for attorney Gibbons. The total compensation due to Plaintiff from the Defendant is $17,137.46. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
November 23, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Re Motion for Reconsideration of Order filed at Docket 73. Defendant's Responses due by 12/7/2011. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/19/2011. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
November 18, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER regarding Costs and Fees for Discovery Violations. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 11/17/11. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
November 2, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER granting Motion 41 to Compel Production of Photos and Film or for Application of Spoilation of Evidence Rule. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts 11/2/2011. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
May 16, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Holding in abeyance Motion 41 to Compel Production of Photos & Film or for Application of Spoilation of Evidence Rule, until completion of depositions;Denying Motion 44 to Quash Depositions; Granting Motion 48 for Exten sion of Time to Complete Discovery; Accordingly, depositions shall be completed no later than 7/1/2011; Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion at Docket 41 shall be filed by COB on July 15, 2011; Defendants' response, if any, shall be due by COB 7/29/2011. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
March 21, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Re Certification of Trial. Unless Discovery Motions are filed by 3/29/2011, MJ is prepared to certify case ready for trial. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
September 29, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Regarding Certification of Readiness for Trial. Status Report due by 10/15/2010.(JAM, Chambers Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. F/V Lorena Marie, O.N. 939683 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond May
Represented By: Steven V. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Lorena Marie, O.N. 939683
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Skonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Skonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?