Blakeslee v. Shaw Infrastructures, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul Blakeslee
Defendant: Shaw Infrastructures, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00214
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Ralph R. Beistline
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Motion for Remedial Order and to Show Cause 158 , each party shall file and serve responses to the other party's objections to deposition designations by July 5, 2012. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/28/2012. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 1, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 114 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/1/11. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 30, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion in Limine. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/30/11. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 8, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 52 Motion in Limine; GRANTING 55 Motion in Limine; 58 Motion in Limine is GRANTED as to the sexual harassment investigation, and a ruling is reserved as to the time card padding investigation. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/8/11. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 27, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Compel at Docket 23 . (Jan, Chambers Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeslee v. Shaw Infrastructures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Blakeslee
Represented By: Howard S. Trickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Infrastructures, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?