American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression et al v. Sullivan Featured Case

Plaintiff: American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, David & Melissa LLC, Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Donald R. Douglas and Alaska Library Association
Defendant: Daniel S. Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2010cv00193
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Ralph R. Beistline
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 106 Featured Case ORDER and Judgment Granting Attorney Fees and Expenses. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
October 20, 2011 105 Joint MOTION to Grant Fees and Expenses Under 42 U.S.C. 1988 by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(Bamberger, Michael)
October 3, 2011 104 RRB TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file closing paperwork or a Status Report on or before October 24, 2011.(Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 30, 2011 103 NOTICE of Resolution of Pending Motion by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, 100 Response in Opposition to Motion (Bamberger, Michael)
September 21, 2011 102 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Stipulation at Docket 101 is GRANTED. The Reply to the Motion for Attorney Fees at Docket 87 shall be filed on or before September 30, 2011. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 21, 2011 101 NOTICE of Stipulation for Extension for Plaintiffs to Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Application for Attorney's Fees by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, 100 Response in Opposition to Motion (Bamberger, Michael)
September 16, 2011 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by John Burns. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Athens, Marika)
August 30, 2011 99 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/30/11. (LSC, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2011: # 1 Amended Judgment with Fees and Expenses Added) (LSC, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 98 TEXT ORDER: The Non-Opposed Motion for Extension at Docket 97 is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a Response to the Motion for Attorney Fees at Docket 87 on or before September 16, 2011. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
July 28, 2011 97 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Unopposed by John Burns.(Athens, Marika)
July 26, 2011 96 NOTICE RE DOCKETS 88 AND 92: If not already done so, chamber copies of Dockets 88 and 92 need to be provided to the court as they are over 25 pages in length. The chamber copies must be printed with the electronic filing header on each page and be attached to a copy of the notice of electronic filing. See D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures. Thank you. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
July 25, 2011 95 DECLARATION of D. John McKay re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 94 DECLARATION of Stephen E. Jenkins re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 93 DECLARATION of Jonathan Bloom re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 92 DECLARATION of David Horowitz re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 91 DECLARATION of Thomas Stenson re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 90 DECLARATION of Devereux Chatillon re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 89 DECLARATION of Richard M. Zuckerman re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 88 DECLARATION of Michael A. Bamberger re 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 87 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(Bamberger, Michael)
July 25, 2011 86 MOTION to Amend/Correct 85 Judgment, Pursuant to Rule 59 by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Amended Judgment)(Bamberger, Michael)
July 11, 2011 85 JUDGMENT in favor of Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, Donald R. Douglas against John Burns. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/11/11. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2011 84 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motions at 51 and 80 , Denying Motions at 59 and 83 , and Dismissing With Prejudice. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
June 23, 2011 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by John Burns.(Athens, Marika)
June 23, 2011 82 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Burns. (Athens, Marika)
June 16, 2011 81 DECLARATION of Michael A. Bamberger re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
June 16, 2011 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(Bamberger, Michael)
June 8, 2011 79 Featured Case ORDER of Supreme Court of the State of Alaska re certification of questions. The court DECLINES to accept the request. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2011 78 Recusal Notice from Supreme Court of the State of Alaska. (CLW, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2011 77 OPENING NOTICE from the Alaska Supreme Court. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 29, 2011 76 STIPULATED ORDER FOR CERTIFICATION. cc: M. May, Clerk of Appellate Courts w/cert cy of Order and Docket Sheet (RRB/Jan, Chambers Staff) Modified on 4/29/2011 to add distribution (LSC, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2011 75 NOTICE Stipulated Proposed Order for Certification by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 74 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief)(Bamberger, Michael)
April 19, 2011 74 RRB ORDER Regarding Pending Motions. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
April 7, 2011 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Burns. (Athens, Marika)
April 7, 2011 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION Certify to State Court filed by John Burns. (Athens, Marika)
March 24, 2011 71 MOTION for Hearing re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 60 MOTION Certify to State Court Request for Oral Argument by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(Bamberger, Michael)
March 24, 2011 70 MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Combined Memorandum by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation 69 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Book Blizzard LLC, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Alaska Library Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Bosco's, Inc., Entertainment Merchants Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, 68 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by Book Blizzard LLC, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Alaska Library Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, David & Melissa LLC, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Donald R. Douglas, Bosco's, Inc., Entertainment Merchants Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund. (Bamberger, Michael)
March 24, 2011 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 60 MOTION Certify to State Court filed by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
March 24, 2011 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
February 8, 2011 67 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Second Motion for Clarification at Docket 54 . (Jan, Chambers Staff)
February 4, 2011 66 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Non-Opposed Motion for Extension at Docket 65 is GRANTED. Responses are due by 3/24/2011. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
February 3, 2011 65 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 60 MOTION Certify to State Court Unopposed by Daniel S. Sullivan.(Athens, Marika)
February 1, 2011 64 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Stipulation at docket 63 is GRANTED. The time for filing Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendant Burns's Motion for Certification, at docket 60 , shall be extended until February 14, 2011. (LSC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/1/2011 to create relationship to document #60 (LSC, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 63 STIPULATION (NOTICE of Stipulation) for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Certify by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 60 MOTION Certify to State Court (McKay, D.) Modified on 1/31/2011 to correct event (LSC, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/1/2011 to remove relationship to documents #51 and #59 (LSC, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER re 61 Notice of Stipulation for Extension of Time To File Opposition filed by Book Blizzard LLC, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Alaska Library Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Bosco's, Inc., Entertainment Merchants Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund. According to LR 7.1(f)(1) the opposition to the motion for summary judgment at Docket 59 is due 2/14/11. Therefore the Court will not grant the parties stipulation at Docket 61 unless it was the intention of the parties to reduce the time in which to oppose. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2011 61 NOTICE of Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Oppositions by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, 60 MOTION Certify to State Court (McKay, D.)
January 19, 2011 60 MOTION Certify to State Court by John Burns.(Athens, Marika)
January 19, 2011 59 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Burns.(Athens, Marika)
January 19, 2011 Docket Annotation: Errors re 58 Response in Opposition to Motion. Wrong event selected and two documents filed as one. Correction: Counsel to refile document twice, first as a Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and again as Motion for Certification. Link to Motion for Summary Judgment at docket 51 terminated.(LSC, COURT STAFF)
January 18, 2011 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Burns. (Athens, Marika) Modified on 1/19/2011 to remove relationship to document #51 (LSC, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/19/2011 to reflect errors. See docket annotation dated 1/19/11 (LSC, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/19/2011 to relink document to motion at dkt 51; link removed in error (LSC, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2011 to reinstate link to dkt 51; terminated in error (LSC, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2011 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 Second MOTION re 47 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to clarify filed by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
January 6, 2011 56 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Change the Defendant at Docket 55 is GRANTED. The caption shall be changed to reflect John Burns as the current Attorney General for the State of Alaska. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
January 5, 2011 55 First MOTION to Substitute Party by Daniel S. Sullivan.(Athens, Marika)
January 5, 2011 54 Second MOTION re 47 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to clarify by Daniel S. Sullivan.(Athens, Marika)
December 27, 2010 53 Notice to Counsel re 52 Memorandum,,, filed by Book Blizzard LLC, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Alaska Library Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Bosco's, Inc., Entertainment Merchants Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund. A review of the document submitted at dkt 52 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a COURTESY paper copy of the pleading has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a COURTESY paper copy of your filing at dkt 52. The COURTESY paper copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2010 52 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Book Blizzard LLC, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Alaska Library Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Bosco's, Inc., Entertainment Merchants Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund. (Bamberger, Michael)
December 27, 2010 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(Bamberger, Michael)
November 17, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
October 28, 2010 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Clarify filed by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
October 26, 2010 48 MOTION to Clarify by Daniel S. Sullivan re: 47 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (NKD, COURT STAFF for Marika Athens) Modified on 10/26/2010 to change event to Motion(NKD, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER Granting Preliminary Injunction. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
October 8, 2010 46 DECLARATION of David Horowitz re 45 Reply to Response to Motion, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bamberger, Michael)
October 8, 2010 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Bamberger, Michael)
October 1, 2010 44 CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER. Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Meeting Report due by 10/29/2010. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
September 29, 2010 43 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Daniel S. Sullivan.(Athens, Marika)
September 29, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING: Pursuant to motion, Oral Argument (1 hour) on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Docket 5 is rescheduled and will be held on Wednesday, November 3, 2010, at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Counsel/parties needing to attend telephonically shall call 907-677-6246 at the time scheduled for the hearing. If it is determined that oral argument is not necessary, the hearing will be vacated. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 29, 2010 41 TEXT ORDER: The Non-Opposed Motion to Change Date of Oral Argument at Docket 39 is GRANTED. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 28, 2010 40 DECLARATION of COUNSEL (D. JOHN MCKAY) re 39 MOTION re 38 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (UNOPPOSED) MOTION re 38 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (UNOPPOSED) MOTION re 38 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (UNOPPOSED) by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 28, 2010 39 MOTION re 38 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (UNOPPOSED) by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Rescheduling Oral Argument to Nov. 3)(McKay, D.)
September 27, 2010 38 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING: Oral argument (1 hour) will be held on the Motion for Preliminary Injuction at Docket 5 on Thursday, November 4, 2010, at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Ralph R. Beistline. Counse/parties may attend telephonically by filing a Notice of Telephonic Appearance and by calling 907-677-6246 at the time scheduled for the hearing. If it is determined that oral argument is not necessary, the hearing will be vacated. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 27, 2010 37 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief at Docket 21 is GRANTED. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 27, 2010 36 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Non-Opposed Motion for Extension at Docket 34 is GRANTED. The Reply to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Docket 5 is due on or before October 8, 2010. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 26, 2010 35 DECLARATION of Counsel (Michael Bamberger) in Support of Unopposed re 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Memorandum,,, 33 Response in Opposition to Motion (UNOPPOSED) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Memorandum,,, 33 Response in Opposition to Motion (UNOPPOSED) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Memorandum,,, 33 Response in Opposition to Motion (UNOPPOSED) by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 26, 2010 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Memorandum,,, 33 Response in Opposition to Motion (UNOPPOSED) by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension to File Reply)(McKay, D.)
September 22, 2010 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel S. Sullivan. (Athens, Marika)
September 15, 2010 32 TEXT ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension at Docket 30 is GRANTED. Defendant's Answer to the Complaint shall be filed on or before September 29, 2010, and the Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed on or before September 22, 2010. (Jan, Chambers Staff)
September 14, 2010 31 DECLARATION of Marika Athens re 30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed by Daniel S. Sullivan. (Athens, Marika)
September 14, 2010 30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed by Daniel S. Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Athens, Marika)
September 14, 2010 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Marika R. Athens on behalf of Daniel S. Sullivan (Athens, Marika)
September 13, 2010 28 CLERK'S NOTICE re Docket # 3 MOTION for Participation of Non-Resident Counsel for Michael A. Bamberger and Devereux Chatillon; the Applications, at docket 3, are authorized under D.Ak.LR83.1(d). (LSC, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2010 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Stenson as co-counsel for Plaintiffs by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation (McKay, D.)
September 2, 2010 26 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Julie Drake, Title Wave Books by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 19 Declaration, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Julie Drake, Title Wave Books)(McKay, D.) Modified on 9/13/2010 to create relationship to document #5 (LSC, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 25 NOTICE of Filing [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 24 MOTION for Hearing re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 Summons Issued as to Daniel S. Sullivan. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
September 1, 2010 23 Unissued summons re Defendant Daniel S. Sullivan. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
September 1, 2010 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 21 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 20 DECLARATION of Scott Bradner re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 19 DECLARATION of Julie Drake, Title Wave re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.) Modified on 9/13/2010 to reflect error; wrong PDF attached. Declaration of J. Drake filed at dkt 26 and linked to mot at dkt 5 (LSC, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 18 DECLARATION of John Weddleton, Bosco's re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 17 DECLARATION of Donald Douglas, Donald Douglas Photography re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 16 DECLARATION of David Ongley, Alaska Library Association re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 15 DECLARATION of David Cheezem, Fireside Books re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 14 DECLARATION of Crosson Andersen, Entertainment Merchants Association re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 13 DECLARATION of Christopher Finan, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 12 DECLARATION of Charles Brownstein, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 11 DECLARATION of Barbara Jones, Freedom to Read Foundation re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
September 1, 2010 10 DECLARATION of Allan Adler re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 7 Memorandum,,, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
August 31, 2010 9 DECLARATION of Crosson Andersen re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation. (McKay, D.)
August 31, 2010 8 Receipt of $300.00 non-resident attorney payment for Michael A. Bamberger and Devereux Chatillon as to Plaintiffs American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc. Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, David & Melissa LLC, Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's Inc., Donald R. Douglas and Alaska Library Association. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2010 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Book Blizzard LLC, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Alaska Library Association, Freedom to Read Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Bosco's, Inc., Entertainment Merchants Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McKay, D.)
August 31, 2010 6 DECLARATION of Deveereux Chatillon re 3 MOTION for Participation of Non-Resident Counsel for Michael A. Bamberger and Devereux Chatillon by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association and Freedom to Read Foundation. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2010 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association, Freedom to Read Foundation.(McKay, D.)
August 31, 2010 4 DECLARATION of Michael A. Bamberger, re 3 MOTION for Participation of Non-Resident Counsel for Michael A. Bamberger and Devereux Chatillon by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association and Freedom to Read Foundation. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2010 3 MOTION for Participation of Non-Resident Counsel for Michael A. Bamberger and Devereux Chatillon, by Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Book Blizzard LLC, Bosco's, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, David & Melissa LLC, Donald R. Douglas, Entertainment Merchants Association and Freedom to Read Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing for M. Bamberger, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing for D. Chatillon)(NXL, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2010 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (NXL, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Daniel S. Sullivan (Filing fee $ 350. Receipt #ANC002405), filed by Freedom to Read Foundation, Bosco's, Inc., Association of American Publishers, Inc., David & Melissa LLC, Book Blizzard LLC, Donald R. Douglas, American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska, Alaska Library Association, American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund and Entertainment Merchants Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(NXL, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression et al v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Alaska
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comic Book Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entertainment Merchants Association
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom to Read Foundation
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David & Melissa LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Book Blizzard LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bosco's, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Douglas
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Library Association
Represented By: Michael A. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?