In the Matter of the Complaint of Timothy C. Wilkie

Plaintiff: Timothy C. Wilkie
Claimant: Neil Marolt, Derrick Branson and Brian Olsen
Case Number: 3:2011cv00205
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: H. Russel Holland
Referring Judge: John D. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re MOTION 34 to Amend/Correct 20 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. THE MJ recommends the Court GRANT the United States' Motion at Docket 34. This matter shall be referred to the assigned district judge for his determination. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
February 9, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR AMENDED ORDER Issuing Injunction and Granting Motion 17 for Order Approving Stipulation Regarding Security and Directing Issuance of Notice. Bond to be posted and Claims, if any, to be filed by March 16, 2012; existing claimants not required to re-file claim(s); notice to be published in accordance with the rules. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 2/7/2012.(JAM, Chambers Staff)
October 28, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Denying in Part and Granting in Part Claimants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Claimants' Responsive Pleadings shall be due by 12/19/2011. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
October 19, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MJ ROBERTS ORDER Issuing Injunction 4 and Granting Motion 3 for Order Approving Stipulation Regarding Security and Directing Issuance of Notice. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts.(JAM, Chambers Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of Timothy C. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Wilkie
Represented By: Steven J. Shamburek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Neil Marolt
Represented By: Michael T. Stehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Derrick Branson
Represented By: Michael T. Stehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Olsen
Represented By: Michael T. Stehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?