Tate et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: William Tate, Susie Sours, Cynthia Tate, M.T., G.T. and T.T.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2014cv00242
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2017 185 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. See document for details.. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/12/17. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 6, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment will be entered in Advantage's favor on Plaintiffs' claims against the Advantage defendants for failure to triage, failure to manage the code, and failu re to promptly resuscitate. In all other respects, Advantage's motion is denied. This order does not resolve any of Plaintiffs' claims against any of the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/6/17. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 5, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion to Compel. See PDF. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/5/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 21, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/21/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tate
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Sours
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Tate
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T.
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.T.
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.T.
Represented By: David Nelson Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?