JTS, LLC v. Nokian Tyres PLC et al

Plaintiff: JTS, LLC
Defendant: Nokian Tyres PLC, Nokian Tyres, Inc. and Nokian Tyres US Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00254
Filed: December 24, 2014
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Mot for SJ; denying 116 Motion for Ext of Time to File Response; denying as moot 114 , 121 , 128 , and 129 . Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/13/17. (PRR, COURT STAFF)
January 6, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 102 Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Order and the Rules of Discovery; Request for Ruling. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 1/6/17. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 21, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 68 Motion for Sanctions; granting 75 Motion to Compel. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5) the court awards Defendants their reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses directly related to the drafting of the motions at dockets 68 and 75 . Defendants are directed to file an accounting, setting forth the specific amount requested and supporting calculations on or before October 3, 2016. Plaintiff may file a response within seven days of Defendants' filing. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/21/16. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 23, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: GRANTED as to Nokian Holdings, but DENIED as to Nokian PLC. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/23/15. (NKD, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Strike 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/10/15. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTS, LLC v. Nokian Tyres PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTS, LLC
Represented By: Bryon E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokian Tyres PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokian Tyres, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokian Tyres US Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?