Shell Offshore Inc. et al v. Greenpeace, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shell Offshore Inc. and Shell Gulf of Mexico Inc.
Defendant: Greenpeace, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00054
Filed: April 7, 2015
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2015 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT: Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs' motion and finds Greenpeace is in civil contempt of the Court's Preliminary Injunction Order at Docket 111. Court orders sanctions as stated in the order. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 07/30/2015. (CME, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/30/2015 to mark as an Opinion (CME, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: RE 99 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/12/2015. (CME, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EVIDENTIARY MOTIONS:IT IS ORDERED that the motions at Dockets 16 , 44 , 66 , 84 and 88 are each DENIED. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/04/2015. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction 17 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/08/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 11, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting Temporary Restraining Order and Scheduling Further Proceedings 8 . On or before April 17, 2015, Shell may supplement its motion for a Preliminary Injunction 17 ; Defendant's response to the Motion for a Preliminary Injun ction shall be filed by April 22, 2015; reply by April 27, 2015. A hearing on Shell's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 17 is scheduled for April 28, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (see order for full details) Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/11/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 4/11/2015 to reflect correct docket number for Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shell Offshore Inc. et al v. Greenpeace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Offshore Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Leppo(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jason T Morgan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Gulf of Mexico Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Leppo(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jason T Morgan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley Kelman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Benjamin Arthur Krass(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael A. Moberly(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew F. Pawa(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?