Fogleman v. NighSwonger et al
Plaintiff: John Vernon Fogleman
Defendant: Laura Brooks, State of Alaska Inmate Health Care, Zane NighSwonger and S. McCloud
Case Number: 3:2018cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court will change the Nature of Suit in this case from 440 to 550, to correctly identify the case as a Prisoner's Civil Rights case. This action is administrative in nature only. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to John Vernon Fogleman re #11 . (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 JUDGMENT case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/28/18. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 TMB TEXT ORDER: The Court recognizes the Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal at #9 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), the Court DISMISSES the case without prejudice. All outstanding motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to issue a judgment accordingly. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Vernon Fogleman (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER re #1 Complaint; complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Amended complaint due within 45 days. dkt #3 is deferred. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/16/18. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 20, 2018 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT by John Vernon Fogleman. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 13, 2018 Filing 6 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Memorandum from the Department of Corrections by John Vernon Fogleman. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by John Vernon Fogleman (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 5, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to the Court received on 1/5/18 from John Fogleman. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Vernon Fogleman. (Attachments: #1 Acct Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laura Brooks, S. McCloud, Zane NighSwonger, State of Alaska Inmate Health Care, filed by John Vernon Fogleman. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogleman v. NighSwonger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Inmate Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane NighSwonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vernon Fogleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?