Van v. LLR, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Katie Van
Defendant: LLR, Inc. and LuLaRoe, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00197
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Alaska District Court
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 29 Notice to Counsel re #26 MOTION to Request for Judicial Notice and #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. A review of the documents submitted at dkt 26 and 28 confirms that they are over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the documents has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filings at dkt 26 and 28. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 26, 2018 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and (b)(6), and Motion to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and 23(d)(1)(D) by LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC.(Jamieson, Brewster)
October 26, 2018 27 DECLARATION of Jamie Ellis re #28 MOTION to Dismiss by LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jamieson, Brewster) Modified on 10/29/2018 to clarify docket text and link to dkt 28 (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2018 26 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and (b)(6), and Motion to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and 23(d)(1)(D) by LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Jamieson, Brewster) Modified on 10/29/2018 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2018 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Katie Van (Davis, James)
October 19, 2018 24 CLERK'S NOTICE re #22 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randolph T. Moore, at docket #22 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2018 23 CLERK'S NOTICE re #21 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven T. Graham, at docket #21 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2018 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Randolph T. Moore. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2596696.) by LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC.(Moore, Randolph)
October 18, 2018 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Steven T. Graham. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2596615.) by LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC.(Graham, Steven)
September 27, 2018 20 Featured Case INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 11/19/18. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/27/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants answer or other response to the Amended Complaint is due 10/26/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2018 18 CLERK'S NOTICE re #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin W. Tucker, at docket #12 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2018 17 CLERK'S NOTICE re #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly K. Iverson, at docket #11 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2018 16 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Bruce Carlson, at docket #10 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2018 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint Unopposed by LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jamieson, Brewster)
September 26, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Baylous on behalf of LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC (Baylous, Michael)
September 26, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brewster H. Jamieson on behalf of LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC (Jamieson, Brewster)
September 26, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin W. Tucker. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2585664.) by Katie Van.(Tucker, Kevin)
September 26, 2018 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kelly K. Iverson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2585663.) by Katie Van.(Iverson, Kelly)
September 26, 2018 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney R. Bruce Carlson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2585662.) by Katie Van.(Carlson, R.)
September 19, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/19/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2018 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Katie Van. (Davis, James)
September 17, 2018 7 Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, James)
September 13, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a civil action; class action complaint jury trial demanded served on Robert A. Loll on Sep. 07, 2018, filed by Katie Van. (Davis, James)
September 13, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a civil action; class action complaint jury trial demanded served on Lorina Montano on Sep. 07, 2018, filed by Katie Van. (Davis, James)
September 13, 2018 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Davis, James)
September 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to LLR, Inc., LuLaRoe, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2018 3 Unissued summons re Defendant LLR, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant LulaRoe, LLC)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 5, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, James)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2573902.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Davis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van v. LLR, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLR, Inc.
Represented By: Randolph T. Moore
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Represented By: Steven T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LuLaRoe, LLC
Represented By: Randolph T. Moore
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Represented By: Steven T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Van
Represented By: Goriune Dudukgian
Represented By: James J. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?