Catania v. ASRC Energy Services

Plaintiff: Joseph Catania
Defendant: ASRC Energy Services and ASRC Energy Services Alaska, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00202
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Alaska District Court
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 12 NOTICE of Waiver of Jury by Joseph Catania re #11 Order, Set Deadlines (Zorea, Isaac)
October 26, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER re Parties to Respond. Parties to submit their response to the Scheduling and Planning Order #10 as indicated in the Order by 11/1/2018. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 10 Featured Case SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact discovery completed by 8/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2019. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/16/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 12, 2018 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zorea, Isaac)
September 28, 2018 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by ASRC Energy Services Alaska, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(Ryman, Danielle)
September 20, 2018 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by ASRC Energy Services Alaska, Inc. (Ryman, Danielle)
September 19, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/19/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 14, 2018 5 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ASRC Energy Services. (Ryman, Danielle)
September 10, 2018 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Ryman, Danielle)
September 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ASRC Energy Services from Superior Court for the State of Alaska Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-18-07475 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2575640), filed by ASRC Energy Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ryman, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catania v. ASRC Energy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASRC Energy Services
Represented By: Jared Gardner
Represented By: Danielle M. Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASRC Energy Services Alaska, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Gardner
Represented By: Danielle M. Ryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Catania
Represented By: Isaac D. Zorea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?